Haq, Iftikhar Ul (CPSO#: 78911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical center
suite102-984 oliver road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 766-3590
Fax: (807) 766-3586
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iftikharul Haq Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Haq ( CPSO# 78911 )

Business Address:
102 - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 766-3590

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 27 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IFTIKHAR UL HAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Mar 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007