Hards, Andrea Margaret (CPSO#: 93919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
Toronto, ON, M2K 1E1
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Hards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hards ( CPSO# 93919 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA MARGARET HARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012