Hare, Gregory Michael Timothy (CPSO#: 62461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
St. Michael's Hospital
6-504 Queen wing, 30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5259
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory Hare Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hare ( CPSO# 62461 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5259

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7113

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY MICHAEL TIMOTHY HARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991