Hariri, Farzad (CPSO#: 85260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand Genesis Health
Unit 12
9080 yonge st.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

123 edward st
suite 404
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 416-597-0997
Fax: 905-607-0013
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

580 Harwood Avenue South Ajax, ON
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905-683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Hariri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hariri ( CPSO# 85260 )

Business Address:
2000 - 9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (289) 597-7676

Business Address:
400 - 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 597-0997

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARZAD HARIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARIRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011