Harlock, John Anthony (CPSO#: 82407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44644
Fax: (905) 521-0440
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44575
Fax: (905) 521-0440
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John A Harlock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Harlock ( CPSO# 82407 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ANTHONY HARLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARLOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010