Hart, Michael Frederick (CPSO#: 94570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
642 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3G6
Phone: (226) 700-9739
Fax: 866-893-6727
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Hart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hart ( CPSO# 94570 )

Business Address:
642 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3G6
Phone Number: (226) 700-9739

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: 416-398-5932
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy/transfer of their medical record can contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services
Date Received: 19 Jul 2017

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL FREDERICK HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Oct 2010 to 18 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Jan 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Oct 2011 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)