Harwood, Roger Arthur Edwin (CPSO#: 27014)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.A.E. Harwood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 31 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Scarborough Rouge Hospital Centenary Site 2867 Ellesmere Road Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Date Received: 25 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018