Hasany, Aasim (CPSO#: 95638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
235 Martindale Rd, Unit 9
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A5
Phone: (289) 362-3413
Fax: (289) 362-1672
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aasim Hasany Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hasany ( CPSO# 95638 )

Business Address:
235 Martindale Road
Suite 9
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AASIM HASANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASANY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2016