Hasham, Aliya Sabrina (CPSO#: 94036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wellpoint Family Practice
1240 Bay Street - 9th floor
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone: (416) 969-3260
Fax: (416) 971-7718
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Hasham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hasham ( CPSO# 94036 )

Business Address:
Wellpoint Family Practice
1240 Bay Street
9th Floor
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 969-3260

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIYA SABRINA HASHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Dec 2012 to 30 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2012