Hassan, Muhannad Ghanim Sulaiman (CPSO#: 93465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Mosul, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131 Ext. 4891
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Muhannad Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hassan ( CPSO# 93465 )

Business Address:
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHANNAD GHANIM SULAIMAN HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2017