Haywood, Catherine Tessa (CPSO#: 69171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
284 Queen Street East
Suite 219
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone: (905) 451-2285
Fax: (905) 451-2287
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine T. Haywood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Haywood ( CPSO# 69171 )

Business Address:
219 - 284 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone Number: (905) 451-2285

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE TESSA HAYWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYWOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000