Head, Evan Michael (CPSO#: 95247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Head and Dr. MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Macdonald ( CPSO# 99642 )
Dr. E. Head ( CPSO# 95247 )

Business Address:
Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-0022

Business Address:
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVAN MICHAEL HEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2014