Heffernan, Paul Michael (CPSO#: 85458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7M 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-2394
Fax: (613) 549-1459
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-3232
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heffernan & Milne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Milne ( CPSO# 88747 )
Dr. P. Heffernan ( CPSO# 85458 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2394

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL MICHAEL HEFFERNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEFFERNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 07 Aug 2006 to 03 Sep 2006
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008