Heineck, Katja Monique (CPSO#: 90586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
House Calls
c/o SPRINT
140 Merton Street, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4S 1A1
Phone: (416) 481-5099
Fax: (416) 481-2590
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
77 Grenville Street
3rd & 4th Floors
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6060 Ext. x1, x4
Fax: (416) 323-6135
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heineck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Heineck ( CPSO# 90586 )

Business Address:
140 Merton Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4S 1A1
Phone Number: (416) 481-5099

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
77 Grenville Street
3rd & 4th Floors
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATJA MONIQUE HEINECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEINECK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011