Hemphill, Douglas John (CPSO#: 60856)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 721-3344
Fax: (705) 721-5522
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LL1 5 Quarry Ridge Rd.
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
Phone: (705) 797-1112
Fax: (705) 797-1113
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Hemphill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hemphill ( CPSO# 60856 )

Business Address:
301 - 5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 721-3344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JOHN HEMPHILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEMPHILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992