Henry, Patrick David George (CPSO#: 94202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
43 Wellesley st. East Suite 634
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone: 416-967-8741
Fax: 416-967-8704
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Henry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Henry ( CPSO# 94202 )

Business Address:
Suite 634
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8741

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK DAVID GEORGE HENRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010