Herath, Jayantha Chandrasiri (CPSO#: 94614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, Sinhala

Education:Med Univ of Varna Dr. Paraskev Stoyanov, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Provincial Forensic Pathology Unit
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (647) 329-1926
Fax: (416) 314-4060
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

453 Martin Grove Road
Toronto ON  M9B 4M3
Canada
Phone: (416) 248-8531
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Jayantha Chandrasiri Herath may practise medicine independently in
            Anatomical Pathology, only.