Hertzog, Valerie Melissa (CPSO#: 95749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medisys
Suite 210
1545 Carling avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8P9
Phone: (613) 521-8313
Fax: 613-521-8649
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

344 Slater street
Ottawa ON  K1A 0N7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE MELISSA HERTZOG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERTZOG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2013