Hibbert, Rebecca Marie Andree (CPSO#: 82652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hopital - Civic Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street, North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Winchester District Memorial Hospt.
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2422
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital Riverside campu
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Hibbert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hibbert ( CPSO# 82652 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA MARIE ANDREE HIBBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIBBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010