Hicks, Shawn Douglas (CPSO#: 80795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesiology
1053 Carling Avenue, Suite B309
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shawn Hicks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hicks ( CPSO# 80795 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital-Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesiology
Room B309
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 818-9463

Business Address:
General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8219

Business Address:
Riverside Hospital
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8219

Business Address:
Ottawa GI Institute
29 - 1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN DOUGLAS HICKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015