Hill, Samantha (CPSO#: 94317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
Department of Surgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Ave, Suite H405
Division of Cardiac Surgery
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6080
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samantha Hill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 2 2015


Corporation Name: Dr. Samantha Hill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hill ( CPSO# 94317 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA HILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010