Hillen, James McLaren (CPSO#: 52649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Treatment Centre
5575 Bath Road
Bath ON  K0H 1G0
Phone: (613) 351-8680
Fax: (613) 351-8682
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

433 Molly McGlynn St
Kingston
Kingston ON  K7K7C2
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Addiction and Mental Health Service
KFLA
385 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1B9
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-1356
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Hillen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hillen ( CPSO# 52649 )

Business Address:
433 Molly McGlynn Street
Kingston ON  K7K 7C2
Phone Number: (613) 483-0386

Business Address:
385 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1B9
Phone Number: (613) 544-1356

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES MCLAREN HILLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985