Hirani, Aliya Mohamed (CPSO#: 93635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: Kanji-Hirani, Aliya Mohamed (used until: 12 Jan 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Kachchi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1J 2H3
Phone: (416) 265-2255
Fax: 416-265-6737
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Baycrest Health Sciences
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Fax: (416) 785-2409
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIYA MOHAMED HIRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2013