Hirsch, Jennifer Eve (CPSO#: 88710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Room 3-206
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8325
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Sleep Institute
Suite 507
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Canada
Phone: (416) 488-6980
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Hirsch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hirsch ( CPSO# 88710 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Room 3-206
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Unit 507
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 488-6980

Business Address:
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 709-9696

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 595-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER EVE HIRSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRSCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013