Hobden, Elisabeth Jane (CPSO#: 79209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Sport Medicine Centre
1370 Clyde Avenue
Nepean ON  K2G 3H8
Phone: (613) 727-2745
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Nordion
447 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 1X8
Canada
Phone: (613) 592-2790
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Canadian Forces Health Services Cen
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613 727-1127
Fax: 613 945-1129
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Nordion
447 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 1X8
Canada
Phone: (613) 592-2790
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISABETH JANE HOBDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOBDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2003 to 01 Jul 2003
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006