Hodgson, Nicole Christina (CPSO#: 71422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Fink, Nicole Christina (used until: 30 Nov 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Surgery Offices
Unit B-3
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 575-6365
Fax: (905) 381-7071
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole C. Hodgson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hodgson ( CPSO# 71422 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Surgery Offices
Unit B-3
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 575-6365

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE CHRISTINA HODGSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002