Hodkinson, Keira (CPSO#: 97979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Hamilton St.
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: (226) 369-0264
Fax: (226) 369-0246
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keira Hodkinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hodkinson ( CPSO# 97979 )

Business Address:
21 Hamilton Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (226) 369-0264

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEIRA HODKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODKINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014