Hofer, Michael (CPSO#: 86657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr Russell M Hall Family Health Cen
PO Box 550
32 South Court Street East
Norwich ON  N0J 1P0
Phone: (519) 863-2338
Fax: (519) 863-2073
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Hofer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hofer ( CPSO# 86657 )

Business Address:
Dr. Russell M Hall Family Health Centre
PO Box 550
32 South Court Street East
Norwich ON  N0J 1P0
Phone Number: (519) 863-2338

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Michael Hofer may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine, in an
            office setting only.