Holden, Dean Albert (CPSO#: 79085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000 Ext. 2777
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
Phone: 613 732-2811
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.A. Holden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Holden ( CPSO# 79085 )

Business Address:
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEAN ALBERT HOLDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2007 to 22 Oct 2007
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009