Hollett, Peter Malcolm (CPSO#: 73826)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Newberry street
Belleville ON  K8N 3N3
Phone: (613) 966-4377
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter M. Hollett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hollett ( CPSO# 73826 )

Business Address:
18 Newberry Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3N3
Phone Number: (613) 966-5443

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MALCOLM HOLLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2003