Hollohan, Kirk Gerard (CPSO#: 69463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
770 South Wenige Drive
London ON  N5X 0H7
Phone: (519) 679-1717
Fax: (519) 679-1716
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brown & Hollohan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brown ( CPSO# 69345 )
Dr. K. Hollohan ( CPSO# 69463 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
770 South Wenige Drive
London ON  N5X 0H7
Phone Number: (519) 386-6936

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRK GERARD HOLLOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLOHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2007