Hong, Dennis (CPSO#: 70422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare, Room G814
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32938
Fax: (905) 521-6123
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natasha Pereira-Hong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Pereira-Hong ( CPSO# 72167 )
Dr. D. Hong ( CPSO# 70422 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone Number: (519) 836-4830


Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis Hong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hong ( CPSO# 70422 )

Business Address:
105 - 21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare, Room G814
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2006