Hood, Nancy Anne (CPSO#: 33172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Nov 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-558-0824
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carmichael Hood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hood ( CPSO# 33172 )
Dr. F. Carmichael ( CPSO# 30970 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY ANNE HOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Dec 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1983