Hoppe, Daniel Joshua (CPSO#: 90589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2401 Yonge Street
Suite LL01
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 544-9065
Fax: (416) 479-8688
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bay-College & Lockwood Clinic
790 Bay Street
Suite 320
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: 416-921-2121 Ext. 260
Fax: 416-929-7316
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL JOSHUA HOPPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPPE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2015