Hopper, Kevin (CPSO#: 93592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Hopper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hopper ( CPSO# 93592 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN HOPPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2012