Hopyan, Sevan (CPSO#: 69134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Orthopaedics
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue, suite S107
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 202045
Fax: (416) 813-6414
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hopyan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hopyan ( CPSO# 85935 )
Dr. S. Hopyan ( CPSO# 69134 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurology
Room A442
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4473

Business Address:
Division of Orthopaedics
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue S107
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7654

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEVAN HOPYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2005