Horlick, Eric Mitchell (CPSO#: 77507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 6E 249
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3835
Fax: (416) 340-3000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke Medical Centre
85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z5W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Horlick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 4 2008


Corporation Name: Eric Horlick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Horlick ( CPSO# 77507 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Room 6E-249
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3835

Business Address:
Etobicoke Medical Centre
400 - 85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone Number: (416) 621-2220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC MITCHELL HORLICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORLICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2002