Hormozdi, Homa (CPSO#: 90855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quality Care Clinic
Suite 414
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 237-7723
Fax: (905) 291-0768
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Homa Hormozdi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hormozdi ( CPSO# 90855 )

Business Address:
Quality Care Clinic
Suite 414
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 237-7723

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOMA HORMOZDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORMOZDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012