Horne, Andrew David (CPSO#: 95113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4R4
Phone: (613) 724-5852
Fax: (613) 724-9965
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Horne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Horne ( CPSO# 95113 )

Business Address:
Suite 309 - 383 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4R4
Phone Number: (613) 724-5852

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID HORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013