Hossain, Nasreen (CPSO#: 96271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Rajshahi Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
dorchester medical center
4327 hamilton road
Dorchester ON  N0L 1G3
Phone: (519) 202-7391 Ext. 1
Fax: (519) 202-7394
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Hossain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. HOSSAIN ( CPSO# 96271 )

Business Address:
4327 Hamilton Road
Dorchester ON  N0L 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 202-7391

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASREEN HOSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2013