Howell, Brandon George (CPSO#: 84663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chancellors Way Medical Arts Centre
Suite 106
175 Chancellors Way
Guelph ON  N1G 0E9
Phone: (519) 763-0777
Fax: (226) 486-0171
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brandon Howell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Howell ( CPSO# 84663 )

Business Address:
Chancellors Way Medical Arts Centre
Suite 106
175 Chancellors Way
Guelph ON  N1G 0E9
Phone Number: (519) 763-0777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANDON GEORGE HOWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 11 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 12 Aug 2009 to 11 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 12 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011