Hu, Lin Aung Rex (CPSO#: 89456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Burmese, English

Education:Institue of Medicine II, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Golden Mile Walk-in Clinic
1880 Eglinton Avenue E, #152
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone: (416) 285-7575
Fax: 416-285-7574
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI The Doctor's Office
(all walk in clinics,GTA locations)
200 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2J3
Canada
Phone: 416-368-6787
Fax: 416-368-7632
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Comprehensive Healthcare Network
(CHN- all walk in clinic locations)
3502 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M1L 1E1
Canada
Phone: 647-984-6172
Fax: 647-347-6172
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Dufferin Family Care Centre
(walk in clinic)
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 3N4
Canada
Phone: 416-739-1562
Fax: 416-739-6671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. Rex Hu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hu ( CPSO# 89456 )

Business Address:
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 553-5248

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIN AUNG REX HU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011