Huard, Pierre Joseph (CPSO#: 28727)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre Huard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 2 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Dante Pascali Suite 106 152 Cleopatra Drive Ottawa ON K2G 5X2
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018