Hudson, Andrew (CPSO#: 96066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
203-348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-2145
Fax: (705) 789-4622
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hudson and Love Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Love ( CPSO# 95327 )
Dr. A. Hudson ( CPSO# 96066 )

Business Address:
203 - 348 Muskoka Road
3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-2145

Business Address:
Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013