Hughes, Brian Donald (CPSO#: 74695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
289 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T3
Phone: (519) 273-7400
Fax: (519) 273-2899
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hughes ( CPSO# 74695 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 271-2120

Business Address:
Clinton Public Hospital
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3440

Business Address:
Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3120

Business Address:
289 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T3
Phone Number: (519) 273-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN DONALD HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2005