Hughes, Julie Karen Jean (CPSO#: 98036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
Old Quebec Street Shoppes
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone: 519-824-2290
Fax: 519-515-0335
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 75639
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Joseph's Heathcare Centre
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-6039
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE KAREN JEAN HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2015 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 03 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017