Hum, Teresa Yick Kun (CPSO#: 73999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite A202
3000 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 6E1
Phone: (905) 480-1050
Fax: (905) 480-0898
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Sexual Health Clinic
4261 Highway 7E. Suite B6-9
Markham ON  L3R 9W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 940-1787 Ext. 74211
Fax: (905) 940-9872
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERESA YICK KUN HUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001