Hunter, Andrea Jane (CPSO#: 79155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pediatrics
HSC Room 3A4
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75639
Fax: (905) 521-4981
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Hunter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hunter ( CPSO# 79155 )

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Room HSC 3A4
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA JANE HUNTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007