Husien, Mohamed Elhadi Mohamed (CPSO#: 71809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
106A-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 742-3341
Fax: (519) 742-3320
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grandriver Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Surgical Oncology
106A-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-3341
Fax: (519) 742-3320
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Elhadi Husien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Husien ( CPSO# 71809 )
Dr. A. Erfaei ( CPSO# 78509 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital (K-W)
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
106A - 525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 742-3341

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED ELHADI MOHAMED HUSIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004