Hutchinson, Marie Ellen (CPSO#: 98042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Speedvale Ave
Guelph ON  N1H 1J2
Phone: 5198371848
Fax: 5198372363
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R5C4
Canada
Phone: (519) 633-9292
Fax: (519) 633-9413
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marie Hutchinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hutchinson ( CPSO# 98042 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE ELLEN HUTCHINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017